Global Patent Index - EP 1086915 A2

EP 1086915 A2 2001-03-28 - Method for obtaining a continuous wooden sheet in roll form

Title (en)

Method for obtaining a continuous wooden sheet in roll form

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Produktion eines kontinuierlichen Holzfurniers in Rollenform

Title (fr)

Méthode pour obtenir une feuille de bois de placage en rouleau

Publication

EP 1086915 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00118259 A

Priority

IT TV990103 A

Abstract (en)

A method for obtaining a continuous wooden sheet (50) in roll form (9), comprising the preparation of semifinished sheets (1) starting from individual sheets of veneer in flitches by arranging them side by side and splicing them laterally with glue. The method further comprises a step for sequentially positioning, along a longitudinal axis, multiple semifinished sheets on a backing (2) which is pre-glued with thermosetting adhesive and is unrolled continuously, with arrangement, on the splice, of a first tear-preventing insert, and with insertion of a second locator insert for optical reading. Hot and cold pressing of the sequentially arranged sheets is then performed, followed by a step for rolling, unrolling and sizing the sheet thus obtained and for re-rolling and trimming the resulting roll. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/00; B65H 18/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27D 5/00 (2006.01); B27D 1/10 (2006.01); B65H 39/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/14 (2013.01); B27D 1/10 (2013.01); B65H 2301/462 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1938 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086915 A2 20010328; EP 1086915 A3 20020313; IT 1311862 B1 20020319; IT TV990103 A1 20010323; KR 20010050566 A 20010615

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: C.B.T. S.P.A.

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 18/00 A, 7B 65H 18/28 B, 7B 27D 1/10 B

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI