Global Patent Index - EP 1086925 A1

EP 1086925 A1 2001-03-28 - Foil-cutter

Title (en)

Foil-cutter

Title (de)

Kapselschneider

Title (fr)

Coupe-capsule de bouchage

Publication

EP 1086925 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810832 A

Priority

CH 174899 A

Abstract (en)

The cap cutter has two halves (22, 23) joined to each other by a connecting part (8). The connecting part provided springing for the two halves. There are resting surfaces (20, 25) between the side parts (2, 3) and the cover parts (4, 5) for the neck of the wine bottle, for support and to reduce friction in turning. The cutting edges (13, 18) of the cutting wheels (12, 16) face the holders.

Abstract (de)

Der Kapselschneider, insbesondere für Weinflaschen, weist zwei Hälften (22, 23) auf, die mit einem Verbindungsteil (8) miteinander verbunden sind. Der Verbindungsteil gewährleistet eine federnde Anordnung der beiden Hälften (22, 23). Zwischen Seitenteilen (2, 3) und Deckenteilen (4, 5) sind Auflageflächen (20, 25) für den Hals der Weinflasche vorgesehen. Diese bilden einerseits eine Abstützungsfunktion und ermöglichen eine möglichst kleine Reibung beim Drehen. Die Schneidkanten (13, 18) der auf Halterungen (11, 17) gehaltenen Schneidrädchen (12, 16) sind so angeordnet, dass sie den Halterungen zugewandt sind. Dies ermöglicht ein erleichtertes Aufsetzen auf die Flasche. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 7/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/46 (2006.01); B67B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/30 (2013.01); B67B 7/0452 (2013.01); B67B 2007/0458 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086925 A1 20010328; CA 2320432 A1 20010324; CH 696319 A5 20070413

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1032579

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-04-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050609

2003-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZYLISS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI