Global Patent Index - EP 1086964 A2

EP 1086964 A2 2001-03-28 - (Meth) acrylate copolymer pour point depressants

Title (en)

(Meth) acrylate copolymer pour point depressants

Title (de)

(Meth)acrylat Copolymere als Fliesspunkt-verringerndes Mittel

Title (fr)

Copolymères de (meth)acrylates comme agent abaissant le point d'écoulement

Publication

EP 1086964 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308259 A

Priority

US 40169399 A

Abstract (en)

A polyalkyl(meth)acrylate copolymer obtainable by polymerising a monomer composition comprising: (A) from about 5 to about 60 weight percent of a C11-C15 alkyl(meth)acrylate; and (B) from about 95 to about 40 weight percent of a C16-C30 alkyl(meth)acrylate is effective as a pour point depressant and can also improve the low temperature viscosity of an oil of lubricating viscosity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 220/18; C10M 145/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 220/06 (2006.01); C08F 220/18 (2006.01); C10M 145/14 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10N 20/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 30/08 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 30/12 (2006.01); C10N 30/18 (2006.01); C10N 40/02 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 220/18 (2013.01); C10M 145/14 (2013.01); C08F 2220/1891 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 145/14 + C10M 145/14
  2. C08F 2220/1891 + C08F 2220/1883
  3. C10M 2209/084 + C10M 2209/084

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086964 A2 20010328; EP 1086964 A3 20020626; EP 1086964 B1 20061129; EP 1086964 B2 20110720; AU 6125300 A 20010329; AU 772149 B2 20040408; BR 0004378 A 20010410; CA 2319866 A1 20010322; CN 1172973 C 20041027; CN 1292391 A 20010425; DE 60032083 D1 20070111; DE 60032083 T2 20070621; DE 60032083 T3 20120112; JP 2001122925 A 20010508; KR 100420387 B1 20040304; KR 20010050597 A 20010615; SG 92740 A1 20021119; US 6255261 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-08 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 60032083

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110720

2011-07-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20110720

2011-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2011-07-20 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 60032083

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2007-11-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: EVONIK ROHMAX ADDITIVES GMBH

- Effective date: 20070810

2007-09-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ROHMAX ADDITIVES GMBH

- Effective date: 20070810

2007-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60032083

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-01-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-11-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061129

2005-09-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AFTON CHEMICAL INTANGIBLES LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040910

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI