Global patent index - EP 1086987 A1

EP 1086987 A1 2001-03-28 - Method of fabricating composite fluoroplastic articles

Title (en)

Method of fabricating composite fluoroplastic articles

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kompositartikeln aus Fluoroplasten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication des articles composés fluoroplastiques

Publication

EP 1086987 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00308467 A

Priority

JP 27154999 A

Abstract (en)

A method of fabricating composite fluoroplastic articles, the method comprising the steps of melting and blending together a melt-processible fluoropolymer and a liquid-crystal polymer having a melting point at least 20 DEG C higher than that of the fluoropolymer, orienting the blend so as to form molding particles comprised of the liquid-crystal polymer dispersed in a fibrous form within a fluoropolymer matrix, then melt processing the particles at a temperature of at least the melting point of the fluoropolymer but not above the melting point of the liquid-crystal polymer. Composite articles manufactured by the method have good moldability, low linear expansion coefficient and molding shrinkage, and excellent strength and deflection temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/00 (2006.01); B29B 9/00 (2006.01); B29C 45/00 (2006.01); C08L 27/12 (2006.01); C08L 67/00 (2006.01); C08L 67/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 27/12 (2013.01); C08L 67/00 (2013.01); C08L 67/03 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08L 27/12 + C08L 2666/14

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086987 A1 20010328; CN 1295094 A 20010516; JP 2001088162 A 20010403

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI