Global Patent Index - EP 1087008 A1

EP 1087008 A1 2001-03-28 - Multigrade crankcase lubricating oil compositions

Title (en)

Multigrade crankcase lubricating oil compositions

Title (de)

Multigrad Schmiermittelzusammensetzungen für Motorgehäuse

Title (fr)

Des compositions lubrifiantes multigrades de carter

Publication

EP 1087008 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203027 A

Priority

  • EP 00203027 A
  • EP 99118605 A
  • US 66679800 A

Abstract (en)

An SAE 0W-30 or 5W-30 or 5W-20 lubricant has a Noack volatility of less than 15, optionally an M-111 fuel economy of 1.5% or less, and a chlorine content of less than 100 ppm. The lubricant comprises a basestock containing from 0 to less than 10% Group I and/or Group II basestocks, a molybdenum additive providing not greater than 1000 ppm of molybdenum to the lubricant, a calcium detergent providing 10 or greater mmoles of surfactant per kilogram of lubricant, one or more other additives, and a viscosity modifier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/045 (2013.01); C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0206 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/06 (2013.01); C10M 2207/08 (2013.01); C10M 2207/09 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2805 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2207/345 (2013.01); C10M 2207/40 (2013.01); C10M 2207/401 (2013.01); C10M 2207/404 (2013.01); C10M 2207/4045 (2013.01); C10M 2215/00 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/087 (2013.01); C10M 2219/088 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2227/09 (2013.01); C10N 2210/00 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/102 (2013.01); C10N 2240/103 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01); C10N 2270/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 169/045 + C10M 101/04 + C10M 105/32 + C10M 107/02 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 133/02 + C10M 133/12 + C10M 135/10 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 137/10 + C10M 159/18 + C10M 129/22 + C10M 129/24

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087008 A1 20010328; EP 1087008 B1 20050511; EP 1087008 B2 20080806

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160805

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-01-05 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2008-10-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-08-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2008-05-07 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 169/04 20060101AFI20080401BHEP

2008-05-07 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 10/04 20060101ALN20080401BHEP

2008-05-07 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 10/12 20060101ALN20080401BHEP

2008-05-07 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 30/00 20060101ALN20080401BHEP

2008-05-07 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10N 40/25 20060101ALN20080401BHEP

2006-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AFTON CHEMICAL CORPORATION

2006-04-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AFTON CHEMICAL CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20060210

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020044 P 20050616

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WALKER, JULIET V.

2005-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BELL, IAN ALEXANDER

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI