Global Patent Index - EP 1087029 A3

EP 1087029 A3 2001-05-16 - Improved steel composition

Title (en)

Improved steel composition

Title (de)

Verbesserte Stahlzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition améliorée d'acier

Publication

EP 1087029 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00107561 A

Priority

GB 9922757 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2345491A] The invention relates to an austenitic stainless steel composition which is substantially free of nickel and which can be used for medical implants and/or jewellery manufacture. The steel comprises 0 - 0.15% C, 0 - 0.3% Si, 12 - 25% Mn, 12 - 20% Cr, 0 - 2.4% Mo, 0.3 0 - 0.55% N, 0 - 10% Co, 0 - 0.9% Cu, Ni less than 0.05% balance Fe and incidental impurities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/38 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/38 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 4242757 C1 19940324 - KRUPP VDM GMBH [DE]
  • [X] GB 778597 A 19570710 - FORD MOTOR CO
  • [X] FR 2493344 A1 19820507 - GEN ELECTRIC [US]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 10 31 August 1998 (1998-08-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 085 (C - 410) 14 March 1987 (1987-03-14)
  • [A] MENZEL ET AL: "High nitrogen containing Ni-free austenitic steels for medical applications", ISIJ INTERNATIONAL,JP,TOKYO, vol. 7, no. 36, 1996, pages 893 - 900, XP002074520

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 0008103 D0 20000524; GB 2345491 A 20000712; GB 2345491 B 20001206; EP 1087029 A2 20010328; EP 1087029 A3 20010516; GB 9922757 D0 19991124

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020108

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI