Global Patent Index - EP 1087049 A2

EP 1087049 A2 2001-03-28 - Latch opener for a knitting machine

Title (en)

Latch opener for a knitting machine

Title (de)

Zungenöffner für eine Strickmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ouverture de clapet pour un métier à tricoter

Publication

EP 1087049 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307938 A

Priority

JP 25816999 A

Abstract (en)

A latch opener (11) comprises an opening section (1a,1b) for opening the closed latch of a knitting needle (7) and a holding section (2) for holding the opening section. The opening section is pivotally supported on the holding section (2) by means of a pivot pin (5) such that the opening section can move between an operational position (A), in which the latch is opened, and a non-operational position (B) in which the latch is not opened. At least one first magnet is secured to the opening section, and at least two magnets (4a,4b) are secured to the holding section (2). The magnet (4a) is secured to the holding section (2) so as to attract, in the operational position (A), the first magnet (3) secured to the opening section, and the magnet (4b) is secured to the holding section (2) so as to repel, in the non-operational position (B), the first magnet (3) secured to the opening section. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087049 A2 20010328; EP 1087049 A3 20030212; EP 1087049 B1 20070314; DE 60033897 D1 20070426; DE 60033897 T2 20080110; JP 2001081654 A 20010327; JP 4177941 B2 20081105; TW 470094 U 20011221

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070913

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070913

2008-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071217

2007-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60033897 P 20070426

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2007-03-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI