Global patent index - EP 1087057 A2

EP 1087057 A2 2001-03-28 - Calender

Title (en)

Calender

Title (de)

Kalander

Title (fr)

Calandre

Publication

EP 1087057 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119970 A

Priority

DE 19945780 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19945780C1] The intermediate roller (8) in a calender roller stack has a bearing support mounting (2) with an overload safety system (41). The overload safety system (41) is tripped by forces so that, on a breach of a given force threshold value, the force loading is reduced on the intermediate roller (8). The intermediate roller (8) is mounted in levers (11), with the overload safety system (41) between at least one lever (11) and the bearing support mounting (2). The overload safety system (41) is fitted to both axial ends of the intermediate calender roller (8), and can be fitted with a force display. The overload safety system can have a hydraulic support which acts parallel to the press direction on the roller (8) or a holder bonded to it, to give a balance between the hydraulic forces on both sides. The balance is achieved by a difference pressure valve, with a rapid force relaxation action for at least one adjustable bending roller in the calender assembly. The hydraulic support can have a hydrostatic action, and have two pretensed hydraulic cylinders. The overload safety system can have a spring unit, and a sensor which reacts to path movements, using parallel plate springs, or it uses a roller axis. The sensor is an end position limit switch or a non-contact proximity switch. The overload safety system can be a shear bolt (41).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Kalander angegeben mit einer Stuhlung (2), einer oberen Walze, die als Durchbiegungseinstellwalze ausgebildet ist, einer unteren Walze, die als Durchbiegungseinstellwalze ausgebildet ist, und einer Zwischenwalzenanordnung mit einer Zwischenwalze (8), die in der Stuhlung (2) festgelegt ist. Hierbei möchte man die Einwirkungsmöglichkeiten auf eine Materialbahn verbessern können. Hierzu ist die Zwischenwalze (8) mit einer Überlastsicherung (41) versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0226 (2013.01); D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19945780 C1 20010118; EP 1087057 A2 20010328; EP 1087057 A3 20010816; EP 1087057 B1 20040218; US 6701833 B1 20040309

INPADOC legal status

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50005314

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-05-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50005314

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120914

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050905

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060914

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060914

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-09-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060915

2005-09-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-09-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050905

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050823

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-04-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005314

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI