Global Patent Index - EP 1087058 A2

EP 1087058 A2 2001-03-28 - Completely combustible paper

Title (en)

Completely combustible paper

Title (de)

Vollständig verbrennbares Papier

Title (fr)

Papier entièrement combustible

Publication

EP 1087058 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308258 A

Priority

JP 26946899 A

Abstract (en)

A paper having an iron compound catalyst in an amount of 0.1 to 20% by weight, said iron compound catalyst comprising iron oxide hydroxide particles or iron oxide particles having an average particle size of 0.01 to 2.0 mu m; and having a catalytic activity capable of converting not less than 15% by weight of carbon monoxide into carbon dioxide, when 2.8 X 10<-4> mole of iron oxide particles obtained by heat-treating said iron compound catalyst at a temperature of 800 DEG C for 15 minutes in air, are instantaneously contacted with 6.1 X 10<-7> mole of carbon monoxide at a temperature of 250 DEG C at a space velocity of 42,400 h<-1> in an inert gas atmosphere using a pulse catalytic reactor. The paper of the present invention not only maintains inherent functions as papers, but also can be completely burned and inhibited from generating harmful substances upon incineration thereof after use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 27/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/745 (2006.01); D21H 17/65 (2006.01); D21H 17/67 (2006.01); D21H 21/14 (2006.01); D21H 27/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/16 (2013.01); D21H 17/675 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087058 A2 20010328; EP 1087058 A3 20020306; CN 1289877 A 20010404; JP 2001089995 A 20010403; KR 20010050519 A 20010615

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040331

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB IT NL

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI