Global Patent Index - EP 1087068 A2

EP 1087068 A2 2001-03-28 - Building skeleton

Title (en)

Building skeleton

Title (de)

Gebäudeskelett

Title (fr)

Squelette pour un bâtiment

Publication

EP 1087068 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119616 A

Priority

DE 19945550 A

Abstract (en)

The skeleton for a building structure has profile rails (2) as the support and carrier members. The rails have a symmetrical I-shape in cross section, with identical rectangular head sections (4) linked by the center stem (6). The head sections (4) each have a longitudinal groove (8) at the upper sides, away from the center stem (6) in a rectangular shape and cut back. The center stem (6) and the walls of the head sections (4) each have a thickness of 4 mm, the outer head width (KB) is 60 mm and the outer head height (KH) is 19 mm, the extended groove width (EN) is 52 mm, the outer profile height (PH) is 175 mm and the width of the groove (8) opening (OB) is 40 mm.

Abstract (de)

Gebäudeskelett mit tragenden Profilschienen (2) als Stützen und Träger, welche im Querschnitt gesehen eine zur Querschnittsmitte symmetrische I-Form haben mit zwei identischen rechteckigen Köpfen (4) und einem sie verbindenden Steg (6). Die Köpfe (4) haben auf ihrer vom Steg (6) abgewandten Oberseite eine beidseitig rechteckig hinterschnittene Längsnut (8). Der Steg (6) und die Wände der Köpfe (4) um die Längsnut (8) herum haben je eine Dicke von 4 mm, die äußere Kopfbreite (KB) ist 60 mm, die äußere Kopfhöhe (KH) ist 19 mm, die erweiterte Nutbreite (EN) ist 52 mm, die äußere Profilhöhe (PH) ist 175 mm und die Öffnungsbreite (OB) der Längsnuten (8) ist 40 mm. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2006.01); E04B 7/04 (2006.01); E04C 3/06 (2006.01); E04C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/2403 (2013.01); E04B 7/04 (2013.01); E04C 3/06 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0413 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0417 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0439 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0452 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087068 A2 20010328; EP 1087068 A3 20020724; DE 19945550 A1 20010329

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030125

2003-05-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/24 A, 7E 04C 3/06 B

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AK-BAUSYSTEM GMBH

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOLLER, ERNST

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI