Global Patent Index - EP 1087071 A1

EP 1087071 A1 2001-03-28 - Truss table with flipper and method of use

Title (en)

Truss table with flipper and method of use

Title (de)

Tisch mit Schwingarm zum Zusammenbau von Trägerfachwerken und Methode dazu

Title (fr)

Table avec bras basculant pour l'assemblage de poutres en treillis et méthode relative

Publication

EP 1087071 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99307491 A

Priority

  • EP 99307491 A
  • AU 4887799 A
  • CA 2282987 A
  • US 9921901 W
  • ZA 9906203 A

Abstract (en)

Truss table assembly for assembling a truss without manual flipping of the truss. In one embodiment, the truss table assembly includes two truss tables and two flipper arms. Each truss table (24a,24b) has a worksurface that is configured to support the truss members (70,88) as nailing plates are engaged to the truss members. The flipper arms (26a,26b) are configured to flip the truss from a truss member first surface in contact with the worksurfaces to a second surface in contact with the worksurfaces so that nailing plates may be positioned over the truss member second surface and engaged to the truss members. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 3/16; B27F 7/00; B27F 7/15; B27M 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27F 7/15 (2006.01); E04C 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/16 (2013.01); B27F 7/155 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087071 A1 20010328; AU 4887799 A 20011018; AU 755085 B2 20021205; AU 755085 C 20040226; CA 2282987 A1 20010321; CA 2282987 C 20030909; ZA 9906203 B 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040603

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030318

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI