Global patent index - EP 1087072 A1

EP 1087072 A1 2001-03-28 - Roof gutter bracket

Title (en)

Roof gutter bracket

Title (de)

Dachrinnenklemme

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support de gouttière pendante pour toit

Publication

EP 1087072 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402306 A

Priority

EP 99402306 A

Abstract (en)

The suspended gutter support for a roof has a gutter retaining hook (19) attached by one branch (19b) to a fixing gripper (2) engaging the lower free edge of the roof. The branch has a movable clamp arm (8), to grip the roof, locked in place by a screw (14).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un support (1) de gouttière pendante (20) pour toit pentu débordant (4) à crochet porte-gouttière (19) attaché par une branche (19b) à une pince (2) de fixation au bord inférieur libre de toit et par serrage de celui-ci entre une branche de pince (2a) formant mors fixe et un mors mobile interne (8) de celle-ci, en étant déplaçable sur l'autre branche de pince (2b) par une vis de manoeuvre (14). Le mors fixe est constitué par la branche de pince (2a) applicable sur la face de dessus du toit (4) tandis que le mors mobile est applicable contre la sous-face de toit et le trou (15) pour la vis (14) étant situé en dehors de la branche de pince formant mors fixe (2a). L'invention est applicable aux toitures de bâtiment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/072

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/072 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0722 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087072 A1 20010328

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040129

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030918

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI