Global Patent Index - EP 1087078 A1

EP 1087078 A1 2001-03-28 - A structure of an easy setup tent

Title (en)

A structure of an easy setup tent

Title (de)

Struktur eines leicht montierbaren Zeltes

Title (fr)

Structure d'une tente aisément démontable

Publication

EP 1087078 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99307533 A

Priority

EP 99307533 A

Abstract (en)

A tent structure comprises a cap 12 having a plurality of poles 141 articulately coupled thereto and extending therefrom. Each pole 141 is articulately coupled to a member 142 which in turn is articulately coupled to a hub 11. The hub 11 and cap 12 are aligned along a central axis of the tent framework, and the position of hub 11 relative to the cap 12 depends upon whether the tent structure is erected or collapsed. The hub 11 is moved in an axial direction into engagement with the cap 12 when erecting the tent structure by pulling rope 21 through the cap 12. When erected, the tent framework has a substantially pyramidal shape with the cap 12 at its apex; the poles 141 are braced outwardly from the central axis by the members 142. When collapsed, the tent framework has an elongate shape with the poles 141 substantially parallel to the central axis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 15/28; E04H 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/28 (2006.01); E04H 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/425 (2013.01); E04H 15/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087078 A1 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030818

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI