Global Patent Index - EP 1087079 A1

EP 1087079 A1 2001-03-28 - Electric striker

Title (en)

Electric striker

Title (de)

Türöffner

Title (fr)

Gâche électrique

Publication

EP 1087079 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118762 A

Priority

EP 99118762 A

Abstract (en)

The door opener has a catch element (3) which is displaced linearly for opening and closing the door, its movement guided via a pair of guide pins (10) fitting through the catch element, provided with coil springs (11) which bias the catch element into a rest position. The catch element may be held in the rest position by a permanent magnet and moved from the rest position into the released position via an electromagnet (13), the actual position of a catch element detected via a detection element, e.g. a Hall sensor or a light barrier. An Independent claim for a door opener installation is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen elektrischen Türöffner mit einem Fallenelement (3), wobei dieses zum Verschliessen und öffnen linear verschiebbar gelagert ist, wobei Mittel (2, 10) zum Führen des Fallenelementes (3) vorgesehen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 63/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/04 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0046 (2013.01); E05B 17/0025 (2013.01); E05B 17/007 (2013.01); E05B 47/0038 (2013.01); E05B 47/0047 (2013.01); E05B 63/248 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0067 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0279878 A1 19880831 - FUSS FRITZ GMBH & CO [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087079 A1 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI