Global Patent Index - EP 1087085 A1

EP 1087085 A1 2001-03-28 - Window, door or the same and frame profile therefor

Title (en)

Window, door or the same and frame profile therefor

Title (de)

Fenster, Tür oder dergleichen sowie Rahmenprofil hierfür

Title (fr)

Fenêtre, porte ou similaires et profile de recouvrement associés

Publication

EP 1087085 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00118932 A

Priority

DE 19943195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1085151A1] The frame profile has a fitment part (10) held by a detent connection with at least one spring elastic detent connector element formed by the frame profile. The bearing face (9) on the fitment part bearing (5) is set forward relative to the shoulder (7) of the detent arm (4) on the frame profile towards the overhang of the detent arm. At least one fitment bearing can be formed as a bearing strip with bearing surface.

Abstract (de)

Ein Fenster, eine Tür oder dergleichen weist einen festen Rahmen und/oder wenigstens einen Flügelrahmen auf, wobei der Flügelrahmen zumindest ein Rahmenprofil (62) umfasst, an welchem wenigstens ein Beschlagteil (70) mittels zweier federelastischer Rastschenkel (64, 78) gehalten ist. Letztere werden von dem Rahmenprofil (62) ausgebildet und stehen an diesem gleichgerichtet vor. Dabei sind die Rastschenkel (64, 78) quer zu der Richtung ihres Überstandes voneinander beabstandet und mit jeweils wenigstens einer Rastnase (66, 79) versehen. Die Rastnasen (66, 79) sind quer zu der Richtung des Überstandes der Rastschenkel (64, 78) federelastisch verform- und/oder auslenkbar und hintergreifen das betreffende Beschlagteil (70) quer zu der Richtung des Überstandes der Rastschenkel (64, 78). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18; E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05C 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087085 A1 20010328; EP 1087085 B1 20051116; AT 288014 T 20050215; AT 310141 T 20051215; DE 19943195 A1 20010322; DE 50011617 D1 20051222; EP 1085151 A1 20010321; EP 1085151 B1 20050126

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50011617

2015-09-24 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50011617

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 310141 T

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110906

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110809

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE)

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060222

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011617 P 20051222

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030102

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010317

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI