Global Patent Index - EP 1087086 A2

EP 1087086 A2 2001-03-28 - Window stay

Title (en)

Window stay

Title (de)

Fensteraussteller

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'arrêt de fenêtres

Publication

EP 1087086 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308399 A

Priority

GB 9922733 A

Abstract (en)

A window stay (1) comprising a stay member (1) and a locating peg (10) which are interengageable to retain a window in an open position, and a retaining member (3) mounted for sliding movement along the stay member and including beneath the stay member an aperture for receiving the peg (1b), the retaining member including (4) first means for positively engaging the peg for preventing movement from the peg, and including second means for positively locating the stay member at a number of selected positions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/18; E05C 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/18 (2006.01); E05C 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/20 (2013.01); E05C 17/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2303171 A 19970212 - HARDWARE & SYSTEMS PATENTS LTD [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087086 A2 20010328; EP 1087086 A3 20030226; GB 9922733 D0 19991124

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-12-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-11-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI