Global Patent Index - EP 1087089 A2

EP 1087089 A2 2001-03-28 - Fastening device for window sills

Title (en)

Fastening device for window sills

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für Fensterbänke

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation pour appuis de fenêtre

Publication

EP 1087089 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114359 A

Priority

DE 19945835 A

Abstract (en)

The mounting for a window ledge (3), of metal of plastics, has an upright and pref. elastic profile (5) screwed to the window frame (1) by a screw (7). The screws are covered by a C-shaped clip bar (9) of metal or pref. plastics.

Abstract (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für Fensterbänke (3) aus Metall oder Kunststoff, wobei ein hochstehender, vorzugsweise über ein elastisches Profilteil am Fensterrahmen (1) anstehender Anschraubsteg (5) der Fensterbank mittels das Profilteil mit durchsetzenden Kopfschrauben (7) am Fensterrahmen (1) befestigt ist, wobei die Kopfschrauben durch eine aufsteckbare querschnittlich im Wesentlichen C-förmige Klipsleiste (9) aus Metall oder vorzugsweise Kunststoff abgedeckt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/702 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087089 A2 20010328; EP 1087089 A3 20010613; DE 19945835 A1 20010426; DE 19945835 C2 20030213

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HERMANN GUTMANN WERKE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI