Global Patent Index - EP 1087093 A2

EP 1087093 A2 2001-03-28 - Roller shutter for openings of buildings, said opening shapes differ from the rectangular shape

Title (en)

Roller shutter for openings of buildings, said opening shapes differ from the rectangular shape

Title (de)

Rolladen für von der Rechteckform abweichende Formen von Gebäudeöffnungen

Title (fr)

Volet roulant pour ouvertures de bâtiments, et dont la forme diffère de la forme rectangulaire

Publication

EP 1087093 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119416 A

Priority

  • DE 19945908 A
  • DE 19945906 A
  • DE 19945905 A
  • DE 20005831 U

Abstract (en)

The blind has a winding shaft (6) parallel to an upper inclined edge of the window, which is rotatably held by at least one support plate (8) at an upper end of a side guide rail (2) and onto which an inclined series of lamellae (18) can be wound. The lower end of the blind has short lamellae (22). At least the short lamellae have projecting slide bodies (30) at their ends on the side of the guide rail, to support the lamellae against their weight and positively hold them to the adjacent lamellae in the unwound state. The lamellae against which the slide bodies lie have support shoulders (76) formed on the edge of the lamella end near the guide rail, which extend over the entire width of the long lamellae.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Rolladen für von der Rechteckform abweichende Formen von Gebäudeöffnungen, insbesondere für trapezförmige Gebäudeöffnungen, mit einer parallel zu einem schrägen oberen Rand der Gebäudeöffnung angeordneten Wickelwelle, welche an wenigstens einer am oberen Ende einer seitlichen Führungsschiene gehaltenen Lagerplatte drehbar aufgenommen und auf welche ein aus in Schräglage aneinander gereihten Lamellen bestehender Panzer als Panzerwicklung (17) aufwickelbar ist, wobei von diesen Lamellen zumindest am unteren Panzerrand frei endende Kurzlamellen (22) im Bereich ihrer führungsschienenseitigen Lamellenenden (29) aus der Lamellenebene vorspringende Gleitkörper (30) aufweisen, welche an der Führungsschiene zur Abstützung entgegen der in Lamellenlängsrichtung wirkenden Komponente der Schwerkraft der Kurzlamellen (22) formschlüssig gehalten sind. Die Erfindung sieht vor, daß für die Lamellen (18, 22), an denen im aufgewickelten Zustand des Rolladenpanzers (16) Gleitkörper (30) von Kurzlamellen (22) anliegen, diese Anlagestelle als Stützkante (76) am Rand (78) des führungsschienenseitigen Lamellenendes (29) ausgebildet ist, welche sich zumindest bei den Langlamellen (18) über die gesamte Lamellenbreite erstreckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/15; E06B 9/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/15 (2006.01); E06B 9/58 (2006.01); E06B 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/58 (2013.01); E06B 9/15 (2013.01); E06B 2009/2494 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087094 A2 20010328; EP 1087094 A3 20030205; EP 1087094 B1 20090610; AT 309445 T 20051115; DE 50011552 D1 20051215; EP 1087093 A2 20010328; EP 1087093 A3 20030129; EP 1087093 B1 20051109

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121008

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROMA KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROMA ROLLADENSYSTEME GMBH, 89331 BURGAU, DE

- Document: DE 50011552

- Effective date: 20120410

2012-05-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011552

- Representative's name: WIEDEMANN, MARKUS, DIPL.-ING.UNIV. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120410

2012-04-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011552

- Representative's name: MARKUS WIEDEMANN, DE

2012-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ROMA KG, DE

- Effective date: 20120111

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ROMA ROLLADENSYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060913

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011552 P 20051215

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2005-11-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/58 A

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/15 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI