Global Patent Index - EP 1087094 A2

EP 1087094 A2 2001-03-28 - Roller shutter for openings of buildings, said opening shapes differ from the rectangular shape

Title (en)

Roller shutter for openings of buildings, said opening shapes differ from the rectangular shape

Title (de)

Rolladen für von der Rechteckform abweichende Formen von Gebäudeöffnungen

Title (fr)

Volet roulant pour ouvertures de bâtiments, et dont la forme diffère de la forme rectangulaire

Publication

EP 1087094 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119417 A

Priority

  • DE 19945908 A
  • DE 19945906 A
  • DE 19945905 A
  • DE 20005831 U

Abstract (en)

The blind has a winding shaft (6) rotatably held by at least one support plate (8) parallel to an upper inclined edge of the window, onto which an inclined series of lamellae can be wound. The bearing plate angle can be adjusted by a hinge joint (52) at the upper end (54) of a guide rail (2). A support unit near the upper end of the guide rail supports the lamellae (22) at least along part of their path between leaving the lamella guide rail and being wound on the winding shaft against the weight of the lamella acting in the longitudinal lamella direction. The support unit forms a circular-arc shaped curve parallel to the bearing plate and has a rigid curved plate (66), which guides the lamellae from the guide rail to the winding shaft. The curved plate is formed as a standardised part with a maximum inclination angle, to mount the roller blind. The actual required inclination angle can be formed by removing an area of the curved plate of the correct size.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Rolladen (1) für von der Rechteckform abweichende Formen von Gebäudeöffnungen, insbesondere für trapezförmige Gebäudeöffnungen, mit einer parallel zu einem schrägen oberen Rand der Gebäudeöffnung angeordneten Wickelwelle (6), auf welche ein aus in Schräglage aneinander gereihten Lamellen (14) bestehender Rolladenpanzer (16) aufwickelbar ist und welche an wenigstens einer Lagerplatte (8) drehbar aufgenommen ist, die mittels einer Gelenkverbindung (52) am oberen Ende (54) einer Lamellen-Führungsschiene (2) gegenüber dieser um eine im wesentlichen horizontale und senkrecht zur Wickelwelle (6) angeordnete Schwenkachse (56) neigungsverstellbar gehalten ist, und mit einer Stützeinrichtung (64) im Bereich des oberen Endes (54) der Lamellen-Führungsschiene (2) zum Abstützen zumindest einiger der Lamellen (22) wenigstens entlang eines Teils ihres Weges zwischen dem Verlassen der Lamellen-Führungschiene (2) und der Aufnahme auf der Wickelwelle (6) entgegen der in Lamellenlängsrichtung wirkenden Komponente der Schwerkraft dieser Lamellen (22). Die Erfindung sieht vor, daß für die Lamellen (22) ein allmählicher, vorzugsweise kreisbogenförmiger Übergang von der Führungsschiene (2) in eine Ebene parallel zur Lagerplatte (8) geschaffen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/15; E06B 9/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/15 (2006.01); E06B 9/58 (2006.01); E06B 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/58 (2013.01); E06B 9/15 (2013.01); E06B 2009/2494 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3725380 C2 19900329

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087094 A2 20010328; EP 1087094 A3 20030205; EP 1087094 B1 20090610; AT 309445 T 20051115; DE 50011552 D1 20051215; EP 1087093 A2 20010328; EP 1087093 A3 20030129; EP 1087093 B1 20051109

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130913

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 433533 T

- Effective date: 20130913

2014-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121008

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: ROMA KG, DE

- Document: AT 433533 T

- Effective date: 20120427

2012-05-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROMA KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROMA ROLLADENSYSTEME GMBH, 89331 BURGAU, DE

- Document: DE 50015657

- Effective date: 20120410

2012-05-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50015657

- Representative's name: WIEDEMANN, MARKUS, DIPL.-ING.UNIV. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120410

2012-05-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50015657

- Representative's name: WIEDEMANN, MARKUS, DIPL.-ING.UNIV. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120220

2012-04-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50015657

- Representative's name: MARKUS WIEDEMANN, DE

2012-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50015657

- Representative's name: MARKUS WIEDEMANN, DE

2012-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ROMA KG, DE

- Effective date: 20120111

2011-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROMA KG

- Free text: ROMA ROLLADENSYSTEME GMBH#OSTPREUSSENSTRASSE 9#89331 BURGAU (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROMA KG#OSTPREUSSENSTRASSE 9,#89331 BURGAU (DE)

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100311

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ROMA ROLLADENSYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090610

2009-11-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2009-07-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015657 P 20090723

2009-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070515

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/58 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/15 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI