Global Patent Index - EP 1087099 A1

EP 1087099 A1 2001-03-28 - Method of competing a well in an unconsolidated subterranean zone

Title (en)

Method of competing a well in an unconsolidated subterranean zone

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Komplettieren von Bohrungen in Lockergesteinszonen

Title (fr)

Méthode d'achèvement de puits dans des formations non consolidées

Publication

EP 1087099 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00306241 A

Priority

US 36171499 A

Abstract (en)

A well bore (10) penetrating an unconsolidated subterranean zone (12) is completed by placing in the zone a slotted liner (20) having an internal sand screen (21) disposed therein. The slotted liner and well bore in the zone are isolated and particulate material is injected into the annulus (22) between the sand screen and the slotted liner and into the annulus (23) between the slotted liner and the well bore, to thereby form a pack of particulate material to reduce or prevent the migration of fines and sand with produced fluids. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/04 (2006.01); E21B 43/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/10 (2013.01); E21B 43/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087099 A1 20010328; AU 4886200 A 20010201; CA 2314392 A1 20010127; NO 20003619 A 20010129; NO 20003619 D0 20000714

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040317

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB IT NL

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI