Global Patent Index - EP 1087120 A2

EP 1087120 A2 2001-03-28 - Method for controlling a capacitive actuator of a fuel injection valve in an engine

Title (en)

Method for controlling a capacitive actuator of a fuel injection valve in an engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Ansteuern eines kapazitiven Stellgliedes eines Kraftstoffeinspritzventils einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode pour commander un organe de réglage capacitif d'injecteur de carburant pour moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 1087120 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119853 A

Priority

DE 19945670 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves determining the amounts of energy (E) fed to the actuator in dependence on the fuel pressure exerted on the actuator. The amount of energy fed to the actuator is proportional to the fuel pressure, to a first approximation. The amount of energy is fed to the actuator by applying a charging voltage to the actuator, dependent on the actuator capacitance, or by charging the actuator at a known voltage for a predetermined charging time.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Ansteuern eines kapazitiven Stellgliedes eines Kraftstoffeinspritzventils einer Brennkraftmaschine zur Erzielung eines konstanten Hubs, bei welchem die Bestimmung der Energiebeträge (E), welche dem Stellglied zugeführt werden, in Abhängigkeit von dem auf das Stellglied wirkenden Kraftstoffdruck (p) erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20; H03K 17/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2006.01); H02N 2/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/2096 (2013.01); F02D 41/008 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2031 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2051 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2200/063 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087120 A2 20010328; EP 1087120 A3 20030502; EP 1087120 B1 20060809; DE 19945670 A1 20010405; DE 19945670 B4 20060112; DE 50013294 D1 20060921; US 6491027 B1 20021210

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090912

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013294 P 20060921

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031103

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/20 A

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03K 17/64 B

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/38 B

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI