Global Patent Index - EP 1087121 A2

EP 1087121 A2 2001-03-28 - Fuel injection control method for direct injection diesel engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection control method for direct injection diesel engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung der Kraftstoffeinspritzung bei einer direkt einspritzenden Dieselbrennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de commande d'injection dans un moteur diesel à injection directe

Publication

EP 1087121 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119237 A

Priority

DE 19945375 A

Abstract (en)

Triggering time for a magnetic valve determines fuel proportions. One or more cylinders are cut off so that corresponding triggering time for a preset threshold is set at zero. Triggering time for remaining cylinders is increased, so that resulting torque stays constant. Threshold for cylinder cut-off is determined by minimum, allowable fuel injection pressure reached by an up-to-the-minute injected fuel amount per cylinder.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Steuerung der Kraftstoffeinspritzung bei einer mehrzylindrigen schnell laufenden direkt einspritzenden Dieselbrennkraftmaschine mit zumindest einer von Magnetventilen Zylinder selektiv gesteuerten nockerigetriebenen Einspritzpumpe. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, den Abfall des Kraftstoffeinspritzdruckes unter einen vorgegebenen noch tolerierbaren Wert bei geringer Drehzahl und Last zu vermeiden. Dazu wird von einer Brennkraftmaschine ausgegangen, bei der die Ansteuerzeit des jeweiligen Magnetventils die Kraftstoffzumessung bestimmt, wobei eine Abschaltung wenigstens eines Zylinders derart erfolgt, dass die entsprechende Ansteuerzeit bei einer vorgegebenen Schwelle auf Null gesetzt wird. Damit das abgegebene Drehmoment konstant bleibt, wird die Ansteuerzeit der übrigen Zylinder erhöht. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Schwelle für die Zylinderabschaltung bestimmt von einem mit der aktuellen Kraftstoffeinspritzmenge pro Zylinder noch erzielbaren zulässigen minimalen Kraftstoffeinspritzdruck. Damit kann auch im Teillastbereich und bei Leerlauf eine saubere Verbrennung mit gutem thermischen Wirkungsgrad und günstigen Abgaswerten erzielt werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02D 17/00; F02D 41/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 17/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02D 41/36 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/38 (2013.01); F02D 17/00 (2013.01); F02D 41/0087 (2013.01); F02D 41/0085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087121 A2 20010328; EP 1087121 A3 20030502; EP 1087121 B1 20041110; DE 19945375 A1 20010329

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130906

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50008580

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130906

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120905

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC (N. D. GES, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50008580

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC (N. D. GES, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50008580

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110323

2009-12-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091105 AND 20091111

2009-11-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091029 AND 20091104

2009-04-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090305 AND 20090311

2009-03-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090219 AND 20090225

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008580

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031025

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/38 A

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/36 B

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02D 17/00 B

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/12 B

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI