Global Patent Index - EP 1087124 A2

EP 1087124 A2 2001-03-28 - Cylinder/crank case for a liquid cooled internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cylinder/crank case for a liquid cooled internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zylinderkurbelgehäuse für inbesondere flüssigkeitsgekühlte Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Bloc-cylindres/vilebrequin pour un moteur à combustion interne refroidi par liquide

Publication

EP 1087124 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117907 A

Priority

DE 19945591 A

Abstract (en)

Fitted by a support collar (4) on a shoulder (5) on a crankcase side, cylinder liners (3) fitted as stand-alone in a crankcase (2) are fixed by a bonding agent (8) to a corresponding crankcase recess (7) by means of a centring collar (6) connecting from the crankshaft side. A peripheral groove (9) adjacent to the centring collar with the corresponding crankcase recess accepts the bonding agent fed in through a feed channel (10) fitted in the crankcase.

Abstract (de)

Für ein Zylinderkurbelgehäuse für insbesondere flüssigkeitsgekühlte Brennkraftmaschinen mit eingesetzten, im Kurbelgehäuse freistehend angeordneten und durch Kleben fixierten Zylinderbuchsen wird vorgeschlagen, dass eine Umfangsnut im Kontaktbereich eines Zentrierbundes der Zylinderbuchse mit der Kurbelgehäuseausnehmung vorgesehen ist zur Aufnahme eines Klebers, der über einen im Kurbelgehäuse angeordneten Zuführkanal eingebracht ist, wobei dem Zuführkanal gegebenenfalls etwa diametral ein Überlaufkanal zugeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00; F02F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087124 A2 20010328; EP 1087124 A3 20020206; EP 1087124 B1 20051102; DE 19945591 A1 20010329; DE 50011495 D1 20051208

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011495 P 20051208

2005-11-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI