Global Patent Index - EP 1087141 A2

EP 1087141 A2 2001-03-28 - Scroll-type compressor

Title (en)

Scroll-type compressor

Title (de)

Spiralverdichter

Title (fr)

Compresseur à spirales

Publication

EP 1087141 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120916 A

Priority

JP 27286399 A

Abstract (en)

A scroll-type compressor having an improved seal structure includes a stationary scroll (11) and a movable scroll (21). Gas is discharged to an inner zone (44) through a discharge port (35) in accordance with orbital movement of the movable scroll (21). The seal structure includes a seal member (46), which is located between a movable base plate (23) and a radial projection (42). The seal member (46) substantially prevents gas that is discharged from the discharge port (35) from flowing radially from the zone (44). The seal member (46) is moved axially by the force of gas pressure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02; F04C 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04C 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 27/005 (2013.01); F04C 18/0215 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H04175483 A 19920623 - HITACHI LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087141 A2 20010328; EP 1087141 A3 20020403; JP 2001090680 A 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021116

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001002

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI