Global Patent Index - EP 1087146 A2

EP 1087146 A2 2001-03-28 - Impeller for fan, fan using the same, and air conditioner using the same

Title (en)

Impeller for fan, fan using the same, and air conditioner using the same

Title (de)

Lüfterrotor, Lüfter und Klimaanlage mit diesem Rotor

Title (fr)

Rotor d' un ventilateur, ventilateur et conditionneur d' air avec un tel rotor

Publication

EP 1087146 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119461 A

Priority

JP 27083099 A

Abstract (en)

It is intended to lessen the effect of the blade end vortex of air generated on the negative pressure surface near the outer circumference of a rotating blade given to the influent air state on other blade rotating behind when it is separated from this blade and flows away. As a result, disturbance of influent air on each succeeding blade is reduced. The influent air coming into each blade is smooth. Unstable phenomena in the succeeding rotating blade such as air separation and decline of speed hardly take place. Accordingly, the blade noise is lowered and the static pressure is enhanced. An impeller (1, 15, 16, 40) has a hub (3, 13) and two blades (2, 14) disposed in the hub. Specifically, each blade has a shape with an aspect ratio (b/L) defined in a range of b/L1 where "L" is the chord length of the blade at a representative square mean radius (Rr) position of each blade of the two blades and "b" is the representative actual length in the radial direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/32 (2006.01); F04D 29/34 (2006.01); F04D 29/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/384 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087146 A2 20010328; EP 1087146 A3 20020403; EP 1087146 B1 20080827; CN 1289897 A 20010404; CN 1297751 C 20070131; ES 2312316 T3 20090301; JP 2001090693 A 20010403; JP 3743222 B2 20060208; MY 131508 A 20070830

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150812

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090528

2009-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2312316 T3

2008-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080403067

2008-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2008-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2007-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071005

2003-02-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES GR IT

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI