Global Patent Index - EP 1087175 A2

EP 1087175 A2 2001-03-28 - Motor vehicle signal lamp

Title (en)

Motor vehicle signal lamp

Title (de)

Signalleuchte für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Feu de signalisation pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1087175 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119468 A

Priority

DE 19946079 A

Abstract (en)

The light source (2) is provided by number of rows of LEDs (4). Between these and the lamp glass (3) is located a transparent light guide (6) with at least one Fresnel element on the side facing the LEDs.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Signalleuchte mit einer Lichtquelle (2) in einem Gehäuse (1) mit einer Lichtscheibe (3). Um Bauraum bei der Signalleuchte einzusparen und bezüglich der Versorgungsspannung unabhängig und störungsfrei sein zu können, wird vorgeschlagen, daß ein Lichtleiterelement (6, 7, 8) aus einem transparenten Medium zwischen der Lichtquelle (2) und der Lichtscheibe (3) angeordnet wird und die Lichtquelle (2) mehrere nebeneinander angeordnete lichtemittierende Dioden (4, 5) umfaßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/215 (2013.01); F21S 48/2212 (2013.01); F21S 48/2237 (2013.01); F21S 48/2268 (2013.01); F21S 48/2281 (2013.01); F21S 48/2287 (2013.01); F21S 48/24 (2013.01); F21W 2101/14 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9613687 A1 19960509 - PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087175 A2 20010328; EP 1087175 A3 20021030; DE 19946079 A1 20010329; DE 19946079 B4 20080814

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040804

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/10 A, 7F 21V 8/00 B, 7B 60Q 1/30 B, 7F 21W 101:14 Z, 7F 21Y 101:02 Z

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI