Global Patent Index - EP 1087177 A1

EP 1087177 A1 2001-03-28 - BURNER AND COMBUSTION FURNACE FOR COMBUSTION AND FLAME HYDROLYSIS AND COMBUSTION METHOD

Title (en)

BURNER AND COMBUSTION FURNACE FOR COMBUSTION AND FLAME HYDROLYSIS AND COMBUSTION METHOD

Title (de)

BRENNER UND OFEN FÜR VERBRENNUNG UND FLAMMHYDROLYSE UND VERBRENNUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

BRULEUR ET FOUR A COMBUSTION DE COMBUSTION ET D'HYDROLYSE A LA FLAMME, ET PROCEDE DE COMBUSTION CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1087177 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912120 A

Priority

JP 9901821 W

Abstract (en)

A burner which prevents obstruction by combustion products has a circularly concentric multi-tube construction of three or more tubes, comprising a central tube which emits a liquid containing a chemical element that forms a solid oxide by combustion or flame hydrolysis, a first outer tube disposed concentrically outside the central tube for emitting a combustion-supporting gas and/or a non-combustible gas, a second outer tube disposed concentrically outside the first outer tube for emitting a combustion-supporting gas and/or a non-combustible gas, and optionally, a passage disposed outside the second outer tube for supplying a combustion-supporting gas and/or a non-combustible gas. The liquid emitted from the central tube is atomized and burned by the combustion-supporting gases and/or non-combustible gases supplied from the outer tubes and the optional passage disposed outside thereof. The flame thereby generated is covered by the combustion-supporting gases and/or non-combustible gases supplied from the outer tubes and the optional passage disposed outside thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/10 (2006.01); F23D 11/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/36 (2013.01); F23D 11/106 (2013.01); F23D 2900/00016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0060286 A1 20001012; EP 1087177 A1 20010328; EP 1087177 A4 20020821; EP 1087177 B1 20111228

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160406

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-24 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69943956

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-03-08 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69943956

- Effective date: 20120308

2011-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2011-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-08-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 03B 37/014 A, 7C 03B 19/14 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB