Global patent index - EP 1087181 A1

EP 1087181 A1 2001-03-28 - Spiral tube gasifier with circulating filter

Title (en)

Spiral tube gasifier with circulating filter

Title (de)

Wendelrohrvergaser mit Umwälzfilter

Title (fr)

Gazéificateur à tube hélicoidal avec filtre de circulation

Publication

EP 1087181 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118055 A

Priority

EP 99118055 A

Abstract (en)

The synthesis gas generation method has a horizontal sluice for continuous supply of a pulverized material to a vaporizer with a vibrating spiral coil and a cyclone for separation of the non-vaporized carbon particles, e.g. the ash.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung stellt einen völlig neuen Typ eines Vergasers da, der kontinuierlich mit Material beschickt wird, das dann in einer vibrierenden Rohrschlange (1 in fig.3) von unten nach oben wandert und dabei vergast wird. Am Ende der Rohrschlange (1 in fig.3) befindet sich ein innenliegender Zyklon (2 in fig.3) für die Grobreinigung. Ein nachgeschaltetes Umwälzfilter (7 in fig.1) mit Industriekoks ist für die Feinreinigung angeschlossen. Die gesammte Einheit ist auf einem Grundrahmen montiert und stellt eine kompakte Strom + Wärme - Koppelungsanlage insbesondere für Biomasse da. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/027; F23G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/06 (2006.01); C10J 3/16 (2006.01); C10J 3/58 (2006.01); F23G 5/027 (2006.01); F23G 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/007 (2013.01); C10J 3/06 (2013.01); C10J 3/16 (2013.01); C10J 3/58 (2013.01); F23G 5/027 (2013.01); F23G 7/10 (2013.01); C10J 2200/09 (2013.01); C10J 2200/156 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0973 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087181 A1 20010328

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040406

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010928

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI