Global Patent Index - EP 1087183 A1

EP 1087183 A1 2001-03-28 - INDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER

Title (en)

INDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER

Title (de)

INNENRAUMEINHEIT FÜR EINE KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

UNITE DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR PREVUE POUR ETRE PLACEE A L'INTERIEUR

Publication

EP 1087183 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922488 A

Priority

  • JP 9902760 W
  • JP 17662198 A

Abstract (en)

An indoor unit of an air conditioner so designed that a top air inlet and its vicinity of the body casing can be cleaned easily. The indoor unit comprises a front air inlet (4) formed in the front of the body casing (1), a top inlet (6) formed in the top of the body casing (1) and a detachable top grating panel (7) slidable in the front-and-rear direction of the body casing (1) and covering the top air inlet (6). To clean the top air inlet (6) and its vicinity, the cleaning person detaches the top grating panel (7) from the front grill (3), and can clean them, and wash them with water necessary, in a safe posture while ascertaining the dirty portions and the extents in a short time with ease. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/08 (2006.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 13/082 (2013.01); F24F 13/084 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087183 A1 20010328; EP 1087183 A4 20020619; EP 1087183 B1 20051012; CN 1195961 C 20050406; CN 1311848 A 20010905; ES 2251193 T3 20060416; JP 3006590 B2 20000207; JP H11351608 A 19991224; WO 9964792 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100527

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100526

2011-03-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101202

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090609

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2251193

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-02-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20050403842

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040930

2002-06-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020507

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 24F 1/00 A, 7F 24F 13/08 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GR IT