Global Patent Index - EP 1087255 A2

EP 1087255 A2 2001-03-28 - Liquid crystal display device

Title (en)

Liquid crystal display device

Title (de)

Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides

Publication

EP 1087255 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119389 A

Priority

JP 26683399 A

Abstract (en)

A liquid crystal display device includes a pixel electrode (PX) and a counter electrode (CT) which are respectively disposed in different layers in a liquid crystal-side pixel area of one (SUB1) of transparent substrates (SUB1, SUB2) disposed to oppose each other with a liquid crystal interposed therebetween. The counter electrode (CT) causes an electric field having a component parallel to the transparent substrates (SUB1, SUB2) to be generated between the counter electrode (CT) and the pixel electrode (PX). One (PX) of the pixel electrode (PX) and the counter electrode (CT) is formed on a side closer to the liquid crystal (LC) than the other electrode (CT) is to the liquid crystal, and the other electrode (CT) is formed of a transparent electrode extended outwardly from at least a periphery of an area on which the one electrode is superposed. In the liquid crystal display device, a conductive layer (FCT) which is capacitive-coupled to each of the pixel electrode (PX) and the counter electrode (CT) is formed between the pixel electrode (PX) and the counter electrode (CT) in order to reduce the drive voltage of the liquid crystal display device and to reduce a load capacitance which occurs between the pixel electrode (PX) and the counter electrode (CT). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/1343; G02F 1/1362

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/30 (2006.01); G02F 1/133 (2006.01); G02F 1/1343 (2006.01); G02F 1/136 (2006.01); G02F 1/1368 (2006.01); G02F 1/1362 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/134363 (2013.01); G02F 1/13439 (2013.01); G02F 1/136213 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

KR 970059800 A 19970812

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087255 A2 20010328; EP 1087255 A3 20030910; EP 1087255 B1 20120328; CN 100363794 C 20080123; CN 1208671 C 20050629; CN 1289067 A 20010328; CN 1680845 A 20051012; CN 1873490 A 20061206; EP 2372443 A1 20111005; EP 2372443 B1 20130703; JP 2001091972 A 20010406; JP 3712899 B2 20051102; KR 100373667 B1 20030226; KR 20010030357 A 20010416; TW I228199 B 20050221; US 6356331 B1 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-25 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 60047024

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130103

2013-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20130103

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120328

2012-07-18 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: VDEP

- Effective date: 20120328

2012-05-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 60047024

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2012-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2011-11-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2011-11-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2009-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20090625

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI