Global Patent Index - EP 1087259 A1

EP 1087259 A1 2001-03-28 - Solution feeding apparatus and solution feeding method

Title (en)

Solution feeding apparatus and solution feeding method

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Lösungszufuhr

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif d'alimentation de solution

Publication

EP 1087259 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00119926 A

Priority

  • JP 26294499 A
  • JP 2000256027 A

Abstract (en)

To obtain a solution feeding apparatus and a solution feeding method that are capable of feeding solution from a container until the container is completely empty while maintaining a precise feeding rate to the end of the feeding process, said apparatus and the method having the effect described above regardless of whether intrusion of a large quantity of air into a solution channel is unavoidable, which tends to happen when a container is connected to an apparatus by using a method other than a penetration method or when a plurality of small containers are connected to an apparatus. Means of Attaining the Object A solution feeding apparatus including a solution-feeding pump connected via, a tube to a container which hermetically contains a solution and is capable of changing its shape in accordance with the amount of its content is provided with a gas-liquid separation tank and a gas detection sensor, said gas-liquid separation tank serving to separate gas from solution and disposed in the portion of the apparatus between the container and the pump, and the gas detection sensor disposed in the gas-liquid separation tank and serving to detect gas that has entered the solution channel. An air pump is operated in sync with the gas detection sensor so as to discharge gas out of the gas-liquid separation tank, thereby constantly maintaining gas in the solution channel at a given quantity. The apparatus is also provided with a solution depletion sensor adapted to detect reduction of the pressure in the solution channel, which pressure reduction results from depletion of the solution in the container. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/10 (2006.01); F04B 53/06 (2006.01); G03D 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03D 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087259 A1 20010328; JP 2001154329 A 20010608

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHUGAI PHOTO CHEMICAL CO. LTD.

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040401

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI