Global patent index - EP 1087346 A1

EP 1087346 A1 2001-03-28 - Modular dispensing unit for a vending machine

Title (en)

Modular dispensing unit for a vending machine

Title (de)

Modulare Warenausgabeeinheit für einen Warenautomaten

Title (fr)

Unité de distribution modulaire pour machine de vente

Publication

EP 1087346 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00120632 A

Priority

DE 19946030 A

Abstract (en)

Modular vending machine has a goods compartment (1) with a rotating body (6) for release of goods items e.g. drinks cans or for loading cans (4). The rotating body (6) has one or more openings (16) for loading of a can and then for its release. An additional moving element (40) in the inner space (2) of the compartment (1) is moved every time the rotating body (6) rotates. The moving element (40) holds the cans in their openings during rotation and ensures that a blockage does not occur.

Abstract (de)

Eine modulare Warenausgabeeinheit für einen Warenautomaten enthält ein Warenfach zur Aufnahme von Waren mit einem drehbar gelagerten Drehkörper an der Ausgabeöffnung des Warenfaches zum Entnehmen und Ausgeben einzelner Waren aus dem Warenfach. Der Drehkörper weist mindestens eine Ausnehmung auf, die in einer Entnahmeposition mit einer Ware aus dem Warenfach befüllt wird und die Ware nach einer vorgegebenen Drehbewegung in einer Ausgabeposition abgibt. In dem Innenraum des Warenfaches ist mindestens ein Bewegungsorgan angeordnet, welches vor und/oder während jeder Drehbewegung des Drehkörpers in Bewegung versetzt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 11/24; G07F 11/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/24 (2006.01); G07F 11/32 (2006.01); G07F 11/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/32 (2013.01); G07F 11/24 (2013.01); G07F 11/44 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087346 A1 20010328; EP 1087346 B1 20040506; AT 266234 T 20040515; AU 6434400 A 20010430; US 6390328 B1 20020521; WO 0124124 A2 20010405

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150921

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150921

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-03-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141002

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-03-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE WURLITZER GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140221

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2013-12-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE WURLITZER GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131024

2013-12-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE WURLITZER GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131024

2013-12-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20131024

2013-12-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131024

2013-12-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131107 AND 20131113

2013-10-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE WURLITZER GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2013-05-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GIBSON GUITAR CORP., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130307

2013-05-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE WURLITZER GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130307

2013-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130307

2013-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20130307

2013-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130307

2012-11-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GIBSON GUITAR CORP., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20121026

2012-11-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121101 AND 20121107

2012-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GIBSON GUITAR CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE WURLITZER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041006

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE *WURLITZER G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE WURLITZER G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-09-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-08-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-08-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030210

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI