Global Patent Index - EP 1087357 A1

EP 1087357 A1 2001-03-28 - Device and method for navigation using a communication network

Title (en)

Device and method for navigation using a communication network

Title (de)

Anordnung und Verfahren zur Zielführung unter Nutzung eines Kommunikationsnetzes

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour navigation par l'intermédiaire d'un réseau de télécommunications

Publication

EP 1087357 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119946 A

Priority

DE 19946162 A

Abstract (en)

A destination guidance structure uses a communications network with an access device, a processor at a network center, a navigational database (ND) linked to the access device and a location finder. A route controller (RKE1) connects via the communications network to a route planner (RPE) and a location finder (SBE1). An output device linked to the route controller via an intermediate transmission device (SRF) issues local information on destination guidance. An Independent claim is also included for a method for destination guidance.

Abstract (de)

Anordnung zur Zielführung unter Nutzung eines Kommunikationsnetzes mit einer Zugangseinrichtung (MG1), einer netzzentralen Verarbeitungseinrichtung, einer an diese angeschlossenen Navigationsdatenbasis (ND), einer Standortbestimmungseinrichtung (SEE1), einer mit der Routenplanungseinrichtung (RPE) und mit der Standortbestimmungseinrichtung (SBE1) über das Kommunikationsnetz verbundenen Routenkontrolleinrichtung (RKE1) sowie einer mit dieser über eine mediale Übertragungseinrichtung (SRF) verbundenen Ausgabeeinrichtung (AE1) zur Ausgabe einer lokalen Zielführungsinformation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0962; G08G 1/123

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0968 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096811 (2013.01); G08G 1/096822 (2013.01); G08G 1/096844 (2013.01); G08G 1/096872 (2013.01); G08G 1/096894 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087357 A1 20010328; EP 1087357 B1 20061102; DE 19946162 A1 20010405; DE 50013681 D1 20061214; US 6529736 B1 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070205

2006-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013681 P 20061214

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2006-11-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI