Global Patent Index - EP 1087383 A2

EP 1087383 A2 2001-03-28 - Apparatus for scanning optical recording media

Title (en)

Apparatus for scanning optical recording media

Title (de)

Gerät zum Abtasten von optischen Aufzeichnungsmedien

Title (fr)

Appareil pour balayer des supports d'enregistrement optiques

Publication

EP 1087383 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00113454 A

Priority

DE 19930513 A

Abstract (en)

The present relation relates to an apparatus for scanning optical recording media (10), having a detection unit (1) with a photodetector (5), an evaluation unit (3), and a connection (2) between detection unit (1) and evaluation unit (3). In apparatuses of this type, voltage coupling is usually provided between detection unit (1) and evaluation unit (3). This has the disadvantage that the two units have to operate approximately in the same voltage range. The object of the present invention is to propose an apparatus of this type in which it is not necessary for detection unit (1) and evaluation unit (3) to operate in the same voltage range. According to the invention, this is achieved by virtue of the fact that the evaluation unit (3) has a controller (7, 8), which holds the input of the connection (IN) at the value of a reference voltage (V REF ) of the detection unit (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/005

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/09 (2006.01); G11B 7/005 (2006.01); G11B 7/13 (2012.01); H03F 1/30 (2006.01); H03F 3/08 (2006.01); H03F 3/45 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03F 3/087 (2013.01); G11B 7/005 (2013.01); G11B 7/13 (2013.01); H03F 1/30 (2013.01); H03F 3/45475 (2013.01); H03F 3/45928 (2013.01); H03F 2200/78 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19930513 A1 20010111; CN 1144187 C 20040331; CN 1287349 A 20010314; EP 1087383 A2 20010328; EP 1087383 A3 20070328; ID 26462 A 20010111; JP 2001067692 A 20010316; US 6650605 B1 20031118

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100407

2010-02-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2008-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2007-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070829

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI