Global patent index - EP 1087503 A1

EP 1087503 A1 2001-03-28 - Switching power supply circuit

Title (en)

Switching power supply circuit

Title (de)

Schaltnetzteil

Title (fr)

Alimentation de puissance à découpage

Publication

EP 1087503 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00308263 A

Priority

JP 26843399 A

Abstract (en)

A switching power supply circuit is disclosed which maintains a power factor which can satisfy actual use conditions against a variation in load or ac input voltage. The switching power supply circuit includes a power factor improvement circuit for a composite resonance converter and is constructed such that a switching output obtained by voltage division by a primary side resonance capacitor formed from a series connection of first and second capacitors is fed back to the power factor improvement circuit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02M 1/12; H02M 1/00; H02M 3/338; H02M 7/217

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02M 7/12 (2006.01); H02M 3/28 (2006.01); H02M 3/338 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02M 1/4241 (2013.01); H02M 3/3385 (2013.01); Y02B 70/126 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0704958 A1 19960403 - SONY CORP [JP]
  • [A] WO 9916163 A2 19990401 - THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 13 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30)
  • [A] UNSELD A ET AL: "SIMPLE PUMP CIRCUIT WITH SINE CHOKE FOR SMPS", COMPONENTS,DE,SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT. MUNCHEN, vol. 33, no. 1, 1 February 1998 (1998-02-01), pages 26 - 28, XP000780590, ISSN: 0945-1137

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087503 A1 20010328; CN 1125527 C 20031022; CN 1294444 A 20010509; ID 27722 A 20010426; JP 2001095251 A 20010406; KR 20010050584 A 20010615; RU 2000124166 A 20020810; TW 480805 B 20020321; US 6301129 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021004

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI