Global Patent Index - EP 1087520 A2

EP 1087520 A2 2001-03-28 - Amplifying device

Title (en)

Amplifying device

Title (de)

Verstärkervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif amplificateur

Publication

EP 1087520 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00125616 A

Priority

  • EP 96118372 A
  • JP 29868495 A
  • JP 32336495 A
  • JP 32336595 A

Abstract (en)

An amplifying device comprises signal separator means (43) for separating an input signal fed to an input terminal (1) into a main signal having its envelope power limited to a value below a predetermined value and a difference signal corresponding to the difference between said main signal and said input signal; a main amplifier (46) for amplifying said main signal; an auxiliary amplifier (47) for amplifying said difference signal; and power combining means (48) for combining the outputs from said main amplifier and said auxiliary amplifier into a composite output for output to an output terminal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03F 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03F 1/3229 (2013.01); H03F 1/3241 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0774833 A1 19970521; EP 0774833 B1 20020925; DE 69623909 D1 20021031; DE 69623909 T2 20030605; DE 69629855 D1 20031009; DE 69629855 T2 20040715; EP 1087520 A2 20010328; EP 1087520 A3 20010418; EP 1087520 B1 20030903; US 5796307 A 19980818

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161114

2016-12-07 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161114

2016-11-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69629855

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-01-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69629855 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0774833 P

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB SE

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUMAGAI, KEN, LIVINGSTAGE MINAMI-SENDAI 702, 305,

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOJIMA, TOSHIO

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NARAHASHI, SHOICHI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2001-03-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 774833

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE