Global Patent Index - EP 1087681 A1

EP 1087681 A1 2001-04-04 - TOOTHBRUSH WITH AN EXCHANGEABLE PART

Title (en)

TOOTHBRUSH WITH AN EXCHANGEABLE PART

Title (de)

ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT EINEM AUSWECHSELBAREN BÜRSTENTEIL

Title (fr)

BROSSE A DENTS A PARTIE DE POILS REMPLA ABLE

Publication

EP 1087681 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929218 A

Priority

  • DE 19827009 A
  • EP 9904128 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827009A1] The invention relates to a toothbrush comprising a handle, a head in the form of an elongated housing which is open on one side, a brush part removably inserted in said housing and having a support with bristles mounted thereon. On the rear side of the support, the inventive toothbrush has a projection penetrating in an opening located in the rear part of the housing. The support with said projection is composed of an elastic rubber material which enables elastic sealing against said housing and with its projection sealing against the opening. The brush part can be ejected from the housing by applying pressure on the projection through elastic deformation of said support. The bristles are fixed to the support by welding or injection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 3/06 (2006.01); A46B 7/04 (2006.01); A46B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965358A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827009 A1 19991223; AT 214244 T 20020315; AU 4610499 A 20000105; AU 749354 B2 20020627; BR 9911271 A 20010313; CA 2334841 A1 19991223; CN 1111374 C 20030618; CN 1305352 A 20010725; EP 1087681 A1 20010404; EP 1087681 B1 20020313; ES 2172335 T3 20020916; JP 2002518072 A 20020625; NO 20006361 A 20001213; NO 20006361 D0 20001213; PL 344869 A1 20011119; PT 1087681 E 20020930; RU 2210967 C2 20030827; WO 9965358 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59900988

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120103

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100716

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090616

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090616

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-03-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080502

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041215

2003-06-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030617

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-19 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030519

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172335

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-06-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900988

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT

2002-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 214244

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001213

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT