Global Patent Index - EP 1087686 A1

EP 1087686 A1 2001-04-04 - DEVICE FOR MAINTAINING AND ADJUSTING PLATELIKE ELEMENTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MAINTAINING AND ADJUSTING PLATELIKE ELEMENTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN UND JUSTIEREN VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN ELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR MAINTENIR ET AJUSTER DES ELEMENTS EN FORME DE PLAQUE

Publication

EP 1087686 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936413 A

Priority

  • DE 9901646 W
  • DE 29810209 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963873A1] A device for maintaining and adjusting platelike elements, especially shower tubs, bath tubs or the like. The inventive device has a lower part (1) that is located at a distance from the floor and provided with an oblong section (7) which can placed in a substantially vertical manner on the floor (3) by means of a leg (2) that is arranged on one end (10) thereof. An upper part (4) is placed on the oblong section (7). Said upper section can be displaced along the oblong section beyond the second end thereof (13) and placed on the platelike element (5). A device (6) for locking the upper part (4) in a relative position to the lower part (1) is also provided. The inventive device makes it possible to carry out a simple and low cost assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/17 (2006.01); E03C 1/328 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/17 (2013.01); E03C 1/328 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963873A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29810209 U1 19980820; AU 5152499 A 19991230; DE 19981024 D2 20010517; DE 29980081 U1 20010222; EP 1087686 A1 20010404; EP 1087686 B1 20030723; WO 9963873 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060509

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-01-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-10-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906366 P 20030828

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE