Global Patent Index - EP 1087799 A1

EP 1087799 A1 2001-04-04 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BIOCOMPATIBLE SURFACES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING BIOCOMPATIBLE SURFACES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIOKOMPATIBLEN OBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES SURFACES BIOCOMPATIBLES

Publication

EP 1087799 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963549 A

Priority

  • EP 98963549 A
  • EP 9808022 W
  • EP 9803465 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 27/00; A61L 31/00; A61L 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/00 (2006.01); A61L 31/00 (2006.01); A61L 33/00 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964085A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087799 A1 20010404

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040825

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KALATCHEV, ALEXEI

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HERBST, FRANZ

2005-03-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KALATCHEV, ALEXEI

2005-03-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERBST, FRANZ

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KALATCHEV, ALEXEI

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HERBST, FRANZ

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KALATCHEV, ALEXEI

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERBST, FRANZ

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE