Global Patent Index - EP 1087846 A2

EP 1087846 A2 2001-04-04 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING FLAT MAIL ITEMS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING FLAT MAIL ITEMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM UMLADEN VON FLACHEN SENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSFERER DES ENVOIS PLATS

Publication

EP 1087846 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99938194 A

Priority

  • DE 9901735 W
  • DE 19827456 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827456A1] The handling method allows a stack of mail items to be transferred from an initial container (1) which can be opened at one side (8) to a second container (2) which is open at the top. The method involves inserting the first container in the second container with the opening side facing downwards, before opening the side for release of the mail items into the second container. The initial container is supported by a pivoting device (7), for insertion in the second container, with opening of the container side being dependent on the container position and re-closing of the opened side after removal from the second container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/3009 (2013.01); B65H 2301/422542 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967031A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827456 A1 19991223; DE 19827456 C2 20000518; EP 1087846 A2 20010404; EP 1087846 B1 20020327; WO 9967031 A2 19991229; WO 9967031 A3 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050614

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-06-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901073 20020502

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000904

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT