Global patent index - EP 1087849 A1

EP 1087849 A1 2001-04-04 - ROLL BENDING DEVICE FOR ROLLING STANDS

Title (en)

ROLL BENDING DEVICE FOR ROLLING STANDS

Title (de)

WALZENBIEGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR WALZGERÜSTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CINTRAGE PAR ROULEAUX POUR CAGES DE LAMINOIR

Publication

EP 1087849 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927858 A

Priority

  • EP 9903846 W
  • IT MI981382 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965621A1] The invention relates to a roll bending device for use in stands for rolling strips and flat products in general. This device consists of a rod (31) and a hook-like element (35) which grip an appendage (9a) of the chock (9) of the roll (1) to be bent, and which are operated hydraulically by respective pistons (30 and 32) slidable in a cylindrical cavity (22). The hook-like element (35) is advantageously formed on the end of a sleeve (33) coupled slidingly with the rod (31); in this manner a compact device which thus occupies little space is obtained and the effects of the elements (31, 35) acting act on the chock (9) of the roll (1) are balanced because they move along the same working axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 29/00 (2006.01); B21B 31/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 29/00 (2013.01); B21B 31/203 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965621A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965621 A1 19991223; AR 019156 A1 20011226; AU 4506099 A 20000105; DE 69902591 D1 20020926; DE 69902591 T2 20030424; EP 1087849 A1 20010404; EP 1087849 B1 20020821; IT 1301734 B1 20000707; IT MI981382 A1 19991217

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-03-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150602

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030522

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902591

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-26

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL