Global patent index - EP 1087851 A1

EP 1087851 A1 2001-04-04 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING A PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER; AND A PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (en)

A METHOD OF PRODUCING A PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER; AND A PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (de)

PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE A PLAQUES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1087851 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931659 A

Priority

  • SE 9900960 W
  • SE 9802175 A
  • SE 9804177 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0000310A1] The plate heat exchanger according to the invention comprises heat transfer plates, which are provided with so called port holes and are permanently joined through brazing to a plate package, the port holes forming port channels through the plate package, an end plate (16), which is permanently connected with an outer heat transfer plate in the plate package and provided with at least one opening (28, 29) communicating with one of the said port channels, and a connection plate (18), which is permanently connected with the end plate (16) and adapted for connection of the plate heat exchanger to a conduit constituting an inlet or outlet for a heat exchange fluid. The connection plate (18) is provided with a through hole (21, 22) and this hole and the opening (28, 29) in the end plate (16) form respective parts of a connection channel. A guiding member, preferably in the form of a sleeve (30, 31), extends in the said connection channel. The sleeve (30, 31) around its periphery is fluid-tightly connected with at least one of the end plate (16) and the connection plate (18). The invention also concerns a method of producing a plate heat exchanger, according to which the guiding member fixes the connection plate (18) in relation to the end plate (16) during the brazing of the plate heat exchanger.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/04; F28D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/04 (2006.01); F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/04 (2013.01); F28D 9/005 (2013.01); F28F 9/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000310A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0000310 A1 20000106; AT 273762 T 20040915; AU 4810299 A 20000117; DE 69919540 D1 20040923; DE 69919540 T2 20041230; EP 1087851 A1 20010404; EP 1087851 B1 20040818; SE 513540 C2 20000925; SE 9804177 D0 19981201; SE 9804177 L 19991217

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150603

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-03-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 273762

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150603

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150603

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69919540

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140612

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140623

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050519

2004-11-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69919540

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI IT LI NL

2004-08-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALFA LAVAL CORPORATE AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030220

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI IT LI NL