Global Patent Index - EP 1087857 A1

EP 1087857 A1 2001-04-04 - DIAMOND CUTTING TOOL

Title (en)

DIAMOND CUTTING TOOL

Title (de)

DIAMANT-SCHNEIDWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL DE TAILLE DE DIAMANT

Publication

EP 1087857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927565 A

Priority

  • DE 19802980 A
  • DE 19859905 A
  • EP 9900532 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937437A1] A cutting tool has a synthetic diamond layer (2) with a cutting edge (5) having a profile with a decreasing thickness structured by etching. Also disclosed is a process for producing such a cutting tool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23P 15/40; B23P 15/28; C04B 41/91; C23C 16/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 15/28 (2006.01); B23P 15/40 (2006.01); C23C 16/27 (2006.01); C23C 16/56 (2006.01); C30B 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23P 15/28 (2013.01); B23P 15/40 (2013.01); C23C 16/56 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937437A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937437 A1 19990729; AU 3251299 A 19990809; BR 9907277 A 20001024; CN 1294542 A 20010509; DE 19859905 A1 19990909; DE 19859905 C2 20020523; EP 1087857 A1 20010404; IL 137360 D0 20010724; JP 2002500963 A 20020115; US 6599178 B1 20030729

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040206

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030925

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000819

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GFD-GESELLSCHAFT FUER DIAMANTPRODUKTE MBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GLUCHE, PETER

2002-04-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FLOETER, ANDRE

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL