Global Patent Index - EP 1087861 A1

EP 1087861 A1 2001-04-04 - DEVICE FOR STORING SCREW TOOLS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR STORING SCREW TOOLS

Title (de)

AUFBEWAHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHRAUBWERKZEUGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RANGEMENT POUR OUTILS DE VISSAGE

Publication

EP 1087861 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929177 A

Priority

  • DE 29810926 U
  • EP 9904027 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965651A1] The invention relates to a device for storing a number (an assortment) of essentially similar screw tools (3) of different sizes. The device has an opening (2) allocated to each screw tool (3). In order to make the inventive storage device (1, 1', 1'') more advantageous to use, it also forms a magnetising/demagnetising device (5, 5').

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25H 3/00 (2006.01); H01F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25H 3/003 (2013.01); H01F 7/0252 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965651A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29810926 U1 19991104; AU 4607799 A 20000105; EP 1087861 A1 20010404; EP 1087861 B1 20020904; JP 2002518190 A 20020625; WO 9965651 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59902578

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140616

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070612

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-06-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060609

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902578

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-10

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WERA WERK HERMANN WERNER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HERMANN WERNER GMBH & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG