Global patent index - EP 1087868 A1

EP 1087868 A1 2001-04-04 - DESK CHAIRMAT WITH HANDLES AND HANG TABS

Title (en)

DESK CHAIRMAT WITH HANDLES AND HANG TABS

Title (de)

SCHREIBTISCHSTUHLMATTE MIT GRIFFEN UND AUFHÄNGVORRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

DESSOUS DE CHAISE DE BUREAU A POIGNEES ET PATTES D'ACCROCHAGE

Publication

EP 1087868 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931798 A

Priority

  • US 9913416 W
  • US 9758698 A
  • US 11020598 A
  • US 23873799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965672A1] A desk chairmat (10) includes a semi-rigid substantially planar member, said member having four side edges (12, 14, 16 and 18), an upper side of the chairmat (10) having a substantially smoother surface (30) and at least one handle (36, 38) attached to said chairmat (10) along one of said side edges (12, 14, 16 and 18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 27/02 (2006.01); B26F 1/44 (2006.01); B29C 47/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/44 (2013.01); A47G 27/0206 (2013.01); B29C 47/0019 (2013.01); B29C 47/32 (2013.01); B26F 1/384 (2013.01); B29C 47/003 (2013.01); B29C 47/0033 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965672 A1 19991223; AU 4822899 A 20000105; CA 2334838 A1 19991223; EP 1087868 A1 20010404; EP 1087868 A4 20020717

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-07-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47G 27/02 A, 7B 32B 3/08 B, 7B 26F 1/44 B, 7B 29C 47/32 B

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001129;LT PAYMENT 20001129;LV PAYMENT 20001129;MK PAYMENT 20001129;RO PAYMENT 20001129;SI PAYMENT 20001129