Global Patent Index - EP 1087887 A1

EP 1087887 A1 2001-04-04 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE TARGETED PLACEMENT OR RECEPTION OF GOODS CARRIED BY AIRCRAFT

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE TARGETED PLACEMENT OR RECEPTION OF GOODS CARRIED BY AIRCRAFT

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM GEZIELTEN ABSETZEN ODER AUFNEHMEN VON GÜTERN AUS LUFTFAHRZEUGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME POUR LE DEPOT OU LA RECEPTION CIBLES DE MARCHANDISES APPORTEES PAR DES AERONEFS

Publication

EP 1087887 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939927 A

Priority

  • DE 9901817 W
  • DE 19827664 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9967131A1] The invention relates to a method for the targeted placement or reception of goods from aircraft in which the landing of the aircraft and the exact spatial positioning thereof can be foregone. The item which is to be unloaded and which is stored on an intermediate platform can be lowered from the aircraft to a certain height above the ground. This lowering process is carried out by a cable system which, to a large degree, decouples the movements of the aircraft with regard to the load. The intermediate platform is supported at the intermediate height with regard to the ground by a three-dimensional framework which absorbs pressure forces. Afterwards, the load is received or lowered by this intermediate platform which is spatially fixed, or both method steps are carried out simultaneously or in succession.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64D 1/22 (2006.01); B64B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64B 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967131A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9967131 A1 19991229; AU 5407099 A 20000110; CA 2336046 A1 19991229; DE 19827664 C1 20000210; EP 1087887 A1 20010404; JP 2002518254 A 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-28 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 20031203

2004-06-16 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18D

2003-08-06 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 20020801

2003-08-06 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030103

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE