Global Patent Index - EP 1087892 A1

EP 1087892 A1 2001-04-04 - THERMOPLASTIC PALLET

Title (en)

THERMOPLASTIC PALLET

Title (de)

PALETTE AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEM KUNSTSTOFF

Title (fr)

PALETTE THERMOPLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1087892 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99918941 A

Priority

  • US 9909593 W
  • US 8717598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962779A1] A foamed engineering thermoplastic resin pallet having a top load bearing deck (2) and a bottom load bearing section (16) and having interdisposed therebetween at least 6 posts (4) and preferably 9 blocks. The bottom section consists of strips of foamed thermoplastic resin and circumferentially define 4 openings (22) which openings accommodate the wheels of a pallet jack. The pallet consists of constituent parts joined by preferably sonic welding. The engineering thermoplastic resin employed herein are high performance engineering polymers such aromatic polycarbonates, polyphenylene ethers, alky-terephthalates, blends thereof and blends thereof with other polymers such as high impact polystyrenes, acrylonitrile-butadiene-styrenes, and other polymers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/0012 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00034 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00069 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00104 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00273 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00288 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00303 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00308 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00318 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00333 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00358 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00363 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00373 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00557 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00562 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00567 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00796 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962779A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962779 A1 19991209; EP 1087892 A1 20010404; JP 2002516792 A 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051012

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040526

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BACCARO, LORENE, ERB

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MACLEAN, STEVEN

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZUBER, PETER, JAMES

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL