Global Patent Index - EP 1087913 A1

EP 1087913 A1 2001-04-04 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING ROCK WOOL WITH SHAPED-FRONT ROTATING CYLINDERS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRODUCING ROCK WOOL WITH SHAPED-FRONT ROTATING CYLINDERS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON STEINWOLLE MIT VORN GEFORMTEN DREHENDEN ZYLINDERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE LAINE DE ROCHE EQUIPE DE CYLINDRES ROTATIFS AYANT UNE PARTIE AVANT FORMEE

Publication

EP 1087913 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917292 A

Priority

  • SI 9900012 W
  • SI 9800142 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959929A1] An axial centrifugal device (1) for producing rock wool (8) from fibers (7) that are obtained from mineral melt (10) by means of a centrifugal force, generated by one or more, usually four, cascading rotating cylinders (3) with fronts shaped so as to form a fan that produces an additional radial air flow (13), which, combined with the axial air flow (12) from the blowing nozzles (6), produces a swirling air flow (9), thus determining a better and more uniform wetting of the mineral fibers by the binder and a better and more uniform mutual intertwining of the mineral fibers, and an additional axial air counter-flow (5), which reduces tearing of the layer of mineral fibers (7) already formed on the accumulation grid (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 37/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 37/05 (2006.01); C03C 25/12 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/00 (2006.01); D01D 13/00 (2006.01); D01H 4/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03C 25/12 (2013.01); C03B 37/055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959929A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959929 A1 19991125; AT 214039 T 20020315; CZ 20002859 A3 20001213; CZ 293907 B6 20040818; DE 69900992 D1 20020411; DE 69900992 T2 20020704; EP 1087913 A1 20010404; EP 1087913 B1 20020306; ES 2174601 T3 20021101; HR P20000772 A2 20011031; HR P20000772 B1 20040430; SI 9800142 A 19991231; SK 17322000 A3 20010611; SK 284197 B6 20041005

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150511

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160627

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150510

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 214039 T

- Effective date: 20150510

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174601 T3

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900992 20020411

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR

2002-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214039 T 20020315

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR