Global Patent Index - EP 1087919 B1

EP 1087919 B1 2002-12-04 - GAS-GENERATING SOLID PYROTECHNIC LOADS BASED ON COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING WATER

Title (en)

GAS-GENERATING SOLID PYROTECHNIC LOADS BASED ON COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING WATER

Title (de)

GASERZEUGENDE FESTE PYROTECHNISCHE LADUNGEN AUF BASIS VON WASSERHALTIGEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

CHARGEMENTS PYROTECHNIQUES SOLIDES GENERATEURS DE GAZ A BASE DE COMPOSITION CONTENANT DE L'EAU

Publication

EP 1087919 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99920902 A

Priority

  • FR 9901206 W
  • FR 9807090 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779426A1] The invention concerns the field of gas-generating solid pyrotechnic compositions consisting of a binding agent with gelling effect, such as polyvinyl alcohol, impregnated with a water and hydroxylammonium nitrate solution in the presence, optionally, of oxidants such as ammonium nitrate or nitramines, stabilising and thickening agents. The invention also concerns the continuous manufacture of pyrotechnic loads (13) by forming said compositions in an extruder (1). The resulting loads are useful in pyrotechnic extinguishers and in gas generators designed for safety in motor vehicles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 31/00; C06B 47/00; C06D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62D 1/06 (2006.01); C06B 31/00 (2006.01); C06B 47/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62D 1/06 (2013.01); C06B 31/00 (2013.01); C06B 47/00 (2013.01); C06D 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779426 A1 19991210; FR 2779426 B1 20000713; AT 228984 T 20021215; DE 69904326 D1 20030116; DE 69904326 T2 20030828; EP 1087919 A1 20010404; EP 1087919 B1 20021204; JP 2002517376 A 20020618; WO 9964375 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69904326

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140522

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69904326

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130607

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130517

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SNPE MATERIAUX ENERGETIQUES, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69904326

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-07-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SME, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69904326

- Effective date: 20130528

2013-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69904326

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69904326

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130528

2013-05-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69904326

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-03-15 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20130213

2013-03-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Effective date: 20130213

2004-07-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SNPE

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1087919E

2003-06-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021204

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904326 20030116

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228984 T 20021215

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010105

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE