Global Patent Index - EP 1087938 A1

EP 1087938 A1 2001-04-04 - INHIBITORS OF NEURAMINIDASES

Title (en)

INHIBITORS OF NEURAMINIDASES

Title (de)

NEURAMINIDASE INHIBITORE

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE NEURAMINIDASES

Publication

EP 1087938 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99918495 A

Priority

  • US 9907949 W
  • US 6580398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954290A1] Disclosed are compounds of formula (I), (II) or (III), which are useful for inhibiting neuraminidases from disease-causing microorganisms, especially, influenza neuraminidase. Also disclosed are compositions and methods for preventing and treating diseases caused by microorganisms having a neuraminidase, processes for preparing the compounds and synthetic intermediates used in these processes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 271/24; A61K 31/16; A61K 31/33; C07C 233/47; C07C 233/52; C07C 237/24; C07C 271/22; C07D 233/54; C07D 263/32; C07D 307/24; C07D 405/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/196 (2006.01); A61K 31/215 (2006.01); A61K 31/341 (2006.01); A61K 31/4164 (2006.01); A61K 31/421 (2006.01); A61P 31/16 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 233/47 (2006.01); C07C 233/52 (2006.01); C07C 237/24 (2006.01); C07C 271/22 (2006.01); C07C 271/24 (2006.01); C07D 233/54 (2006.01); C07D 263/32 (2006.01); C07D 307/24 (2006.01); C07D 317/32 (2006.01); C07D 405/04 (2006.01); C07D 493/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 233/64 (2013.01); C07C 233/52 (2013.01); C07C 237/24 (2013.01); C07C 271/24 (2013.01); C07D 307/24 (2013.01); C07D 317/32 (2013.01); C07D 493/08 (2013.01); C07C 2101/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954290A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954290 A1 19991028; CA 2329660 A1 19991028; EP 1087938 A1 20010404; JP 2002521312 A 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARING, CLARENCE, J.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GU, YU-GUI

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHEN, YUANWEI

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEGOEY, DAVID, A.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GIRANDA, VINCENT, L.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRAMPOVNIK, DAVID, J.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KATI, WARREN, M.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KEMPF, DALE, J.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KENNEDY, APRIL

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIN, ZHEN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MADIGAN, DAROLD, L.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUCHMORE, STEVEN, W.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHAM, HING, L.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEWART, KENT, D.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOLL, VINCENT, S.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUN, MINGHUA

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WANG, GARY, T.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WANG, SHELDON

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YEUNG, MING, C.

2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARING, CLARENCE, J.

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GU, YU-GUI

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHEN, YUANWEI

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEGOEY, DAVID, A.

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GIRANDA, VINCENT, L.

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRAMPOVNIK, DAVID, J.

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KATI, WARREN, M.

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KEMPF, DALE, J.

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001030

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE